skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 24/06/2019 9:31:50 AM

Orrego, Hector

CPSO#: 42117

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 13 Oct 1992
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:University of Chile, 1949

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 29 Mar 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Oct 1985
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Oct 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Oct 1992