skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 16/06/2019 11:07:35 PM

Bhatt, Gunvantrai Jayantilal

CPSO#: 42008

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi, Swahili

Education:University of Birmingham, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 167 Talbot St S Essex, ON N8M 1B7
Date Received: 24 May 2018

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Feb 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Underserviced Area Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1976
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 May 2013
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 01 May 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018