skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 20/06/2019 8:14:39 AM

Rankin, James Gerald D'Arcy

CPSO#: 41428

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2001
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Sydney, 1954

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 22 May 1970
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Aug 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Feb 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2001