skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 19/06/2019 9:12:06 AM

Jana, Elizabeth Victoria

CPSO#: 33673

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Jun 1981
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 16 Aug 1982

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
117 King Street East
Oshawa ON  L1H 1B9
Phone: (905) 721-3561
Fax: (905) 721-6617 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. E. Jana Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 02 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Jana ( CPSO# 33673 )

Business Address:
117 King Street East
Oshawa ON  L1H 1B9
Phone Number: (905) 721-4300

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 23 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ELIZABETH VICTORIA JANA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JANA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 1982