skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 16/06/2019 10:47:10 PM

Page, Francine Marie Gisele

CPSO#: 33573

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 208 du Buzet Gatineau QC J9H 7J6
Date Received: 31 May 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 08 Jun 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017