skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 23/08/2019 10:06:04 AM

Reznick, Richard Keith

CPSO#: 33510

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 Jun 1977
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 12 Jul 1982

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Macklem House
Queen's University
18 Barrie Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Phone: (613) 533 6000 Ext. 78109
Fax: (613) 533-6884 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Richard Reznick Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 13 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Reznick ( CPSO# 33510 )

Business Address:
18 Barrie Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Phone Number: (613) 533-6000

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 24 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RICHARD KEITH REZNICK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REZNICK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1982