skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 17/06/2019 12:49:48 PM

Zwicker, John William

CPSO#: 33507

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Jun 1981
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 1982

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Waypoint Centre For Mental Health
500 Church Street
Penetanguishene ON  L9M 1G3
Phone: (705) 549-3181 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Georgian Bay General Hospital
1112 St. Andrew's Drive
P O Box 760
Midland ON  L4R 1N6
Canada
Phone: (705) 526-1300
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: John Zwicker Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 31 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Zwicker ( CPSO# 33507 )

Business Address:
5 Beck Boulevard
Penetanguishene ON  L9M 1C1
Phone Number: (705) 549-4646

Business Address:
Waypoint Centre for Mental Health
500 Church Street
Penetanguishene ON  L9M 1G3
Phone Number: (705) 549-3181

Business Address:
Georgian Bay General Hospital
P O Box 760
1112 St. Andrews Drive
Midland ON  L4R 4P4
Phone Number: (705) 526-1300

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
Waypoint Centre for Mental Health Care Penetanguishene

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JOHN WILLIAM ZWICKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZWICKER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1982