skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 21/08/2019 1:36:04 AM

Barnes, David Charles

CPSO#: 33452

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 05 Jul 1989
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 02 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Nuclear Medicine Effective: 21 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Nuclear Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Nov 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Jul 1989