skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 18/07/2019 1:20:54 PM

Carter, Jane Yolande

CPSO#: 33306

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 1991
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of London, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 10 Jun 1981 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 20 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 31 Dec 1991
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jun 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Aug 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Apr 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1991