skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 17/07/2019 4:34:50 AM

Drew, Annabel Joan

CPSO#: 33137

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: Duguid-Chisholm, Annabel Joan (used until: 27 Sep 1984 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1987 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 15 Mar 2004 to 06 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Mar 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2008