skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 24/06/2019 10:27:59 AM

Stein, Neal Phillip

CPSO#: 32964

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 11 Nov 1981
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 11 Nov 1981

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 4A
62 Overlea Blvd
Toronto ON  M4H 1C4
Phone: (416) 425-8800
Fax: (416) 425-8801 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

1901 YONGE ST.
UNIT 4
Toronto ON  M4S 1Y6
Canada
Phone: 4164830102
Fax: 4164839393
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: N. P. Stein Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 25 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Stein ( CPSO# 32964 )

Business Address:
4A - 62 Overlea Boulevard
Toronto ON  M4H 1C4
Phone Number: (416) 425-8800

Business Address:
4 - 1901 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4S 1Y6
Phone Number: (416) 483-0102

Medical Records Location

Address: Docudavit Solutions Inc 28 Eugene Street Toronto ON M6B 3Z4 Tel: 1-888-781-9083
Date Received: 09 Aug 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1982 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NEAL PHILLIP STEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEIN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Nov 1981