skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 18/06/2019 4:53:57 PM

Laidlaw, Susan Mae

CPSO#: 32859

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 17 Sep 1981
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Sep 1981

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Nothumberland Hills Hospital
1000 DePalma Dr
Cobourg ON  K9A 5W6
Phone: (905) 377 7768 Electoral District: 06

Additional Practice Location(s)

Viable Health Staffing
Unit 9
6400 Millcreek Dr.
Mississauga ON  L5N 3E7
Canada
Phone: (888) 277-5927
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Susan Laidlaw Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 15 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Laidlaw ( CPSO# 32859 )

Business Address:
Northumberland Hills Hospital
1000 Depalma Drive
Cobourg ON  K9A 5W6
Phone Number: (905) 377-7768

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Northumberland Hills Hospital,Cobourg District General Site Cobourg

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1981 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SUSAN MAE LAIDLAW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAIDLAW is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 1981