skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/06/2019 12:13:29 AM

Parascandalo, Richard John

CPSO#: 32832

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 16 Jun 1980
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 09 Sep 1981

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Maltese

Education:University of Toronto, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Health Care
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 33853
Fax: (905) 527-6019 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. R.J. Parascandalo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 18 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Parascandalo ( CPSO# 32832 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Healthcare
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 05 Jun 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RICHARD JOHN PARASCANDALO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARASCANDALO is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 1981