skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 18/06/2019 5:28:55 PM

Pace, Ronald Fredric

CPSO#: 32677

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Ronald Pace Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 09 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Pace ( CPSO# 32677 )

Business Address:
622 Rosebriar Court
Waterloo ON  N2K 2W9

Medical Records Location

Address: Dr. k Leung 202-751 Victoria St S Kitchener ON N2M 5N4
Date Received: 07 May 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 19 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2019