skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 24/06/2019 3:36:16 PM

Murton, Andrew Grant

CPSO#: 32528

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 16 Jun 1980
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1981

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakeshore Medical Group
502 - 345 Lakeshore Road E
Oakville ON  L6J 1J5
Phone: (905) 845-4511
Fax: 905-845-8133 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Andrew G. Murton Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 14 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Murton ( CPSO# 32528 )

Business Address:
502 - 345 Lakeshore Road East
Oakville ON  L6J 1J5

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1986 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 09 Dec 1992 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANDREW GRANT MURTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MURTON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1981