skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 24/06/2019 3:37:10 PM

Jung, Jack Howan

CPSO#: 32387

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 02 Jan 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 02 Jan 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Jack H. Jung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 8 2018

Medical Records Location

Address: LHSC Medical Genetics Program of Southwestern Ontario 800 Commissioners Road East London ON N6A 5W9
Date Received: 02 Jan 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 18 Nov 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 May 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jan 2018