skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 20/07/2019 6:09:54 PM

Conway, Edward Malcolm

CPSO#: 32236

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 21 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 27 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Mar 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016