skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 23/08/2019 6:11:37 PM

Lossing, Alan Glenn

CPSO#: 32134

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 12 Jun 1978
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3rd Floor
535 Mullock Dr
Newmarket ON  L3Y 5H2
Phone: (905) 953-8787
Fax: (905) 953-0330 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Lossing Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 21 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Lossing ( CPSO# 32134 )

Business Address:
535 Mulock Drive
3rd Floor
Newmarket ON  L3Y 5H2
Phone Number: (905) 953-8787

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 20 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 16 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ALAN GLENN LOSSING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOSSING is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1983