skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 23/08/2019 9:21:55 AM

Cristoveanu, Nicholas John

CPSO#: 32108

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 1979
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 08 Dec 1980

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
791 Princess Street
Suite 201
Kingston ON  K7L 1E9
Phone: (613) 544-2727
Fax: (613) 544-7247 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: N J Cristoveanu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 02 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Cristoveanu ( CPSO# 32108 )

Business Address:
Suite 201
791 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 1E9
Phone Number: (613) 544-2727

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1981 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NICHOLAS JOHN CRISTOVEANU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CRISTOVEANU is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Dec 1980