skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 20/06/2019 1:18:09 PM

Lee-Ng, Marie Madeleine

CPSO#: 32095

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: Lee Chong Ken, Marie Madeleine (used until: 23 Mar 1981 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, Creole, English, French, Hakka, Mandarin

Education:Irish Conjoint Board, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record should contact: DocuDavit Solutions 28 Eugene Street Toronto, ON M6B 3Z4 Tel: (416) 781-9083 Toll Free: 1-888-781-9083 Fax: 1-866-297-9338 Website: http://www.docudavit.com
Date Received: 20 Jun 2013

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jul 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013