skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 23/08/2019 6:45:23 PM

Punthakee, Dinshaw Keki

CPSO#: 32042

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 04 Jun 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi

Education:University of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: N. D. Punthakee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 05 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Punthakee ( CPSO# 32042 )
Dr. N. Punthakee ( CPSO# 28154 )

Business Address:
503 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L9A 1C1
Phone Number: (905) 577-6677

Medical Records Location

Address: 503 Concession St Hamilton ON L9A 1C1
Date Received: 04 Jun 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 18 Nov 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Oct 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Jun 2019