skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 21/08/2019 11:56:53 AM

Youssef, Magdy Boushra

CPSO#: 32019

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Ain Shams University, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Brockville General Hospital 75 Charles St Brockville ON K6V 1S8 or 1285 CT Rd Maitland ON K0E 1P0
Date Received: 25 May 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 14 Mar 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Oct 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018