skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/08/2019 11:39:14 AM

Rice, Clifford Graham

CPSO#: 32017

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 10 Oct 1980
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 10 Oct 1980

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Mem
Main St
Picton
Picton ON  K0K 2T0
Phone: (613) 476-2181 Ext. 4221
Fax: 613-476-8629 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Clifford G. Rice Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 11 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Rice ( CPSO# 32017 )

Business Address:
636 County Road 1
R. R. 8
Picton ON  K0K 2T0
Phone Number: (613) 476-1921

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site Picton
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1981 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CLIFFORD GRAHAM RICE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RICE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Oct 1980