skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 20/07/2019 7:34:38 AM

Mackie, Iain Duncan Fyfe

CPSO#: 32010

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 10 Jun 1998
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 10 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Jun 1998