skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 17/07/2019 4:36:42 AM

Lai, Jacob Ki To

CPSO#: 31987

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 Jun 1979
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Sep 1980

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University HealthNetwork
Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5118 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Jacob Lai Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Lai ( CPSO# 31987 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
399 Bathurst Street
2MCL 208B
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5118

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 04 Jun 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JACOB KI TO LAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 1980