skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 24/06/2019 9:52:37 AM

Deacon, James Emile Joseph

CPSO#: 31984

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 1979
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Sep 1980

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2300 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3G4
Phone: (613) 541-3922
Fax: (613) 541-0744 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: James Deacon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 28 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1981 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JAMES EMILE JOSEPH DEACON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEACON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 1980