skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 16/09/2019 10:37:04 PM

Pym, John

CPSO#: 31909

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 02 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 02 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Adelaide, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery Effective: 08 Dec 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2014