skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/08/2019 11:45:57 AM

Wong, Robert Anthony

CPSO#: 31844

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 03 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cape Town, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: R A Wong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 20 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jun 2015