skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/08/2019 11:42:36 AM

Corrigan, Michael James

CPSO#: 31653

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 25 Jan 1996
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Jan 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Glasgow, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
840 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall ON  K6H 5S5
Phone: 613 933 4712 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Michael J. Corrigan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 27 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Corrigan ( CPSO# 31653 )

Business Address:
840 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall ON  K6H 5S5
Phone Number: (613) 933-4712

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 18 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MICHAEL JAMES CORRIGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CORRIGAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Resident 1 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Jul 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jan 1996