skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 23/08/2019 10:18:05 AM

Lewis, Geraint Wyn

CPSO#: 31624

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Welsh

Education:Welsh National School of Medicine, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Geraint W. Lewis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 16 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: The Ottawa Hospital, Civic Campus 1053 Carling Avenue Ottawa, Ontario K1Y 4E9
Date Received: 11 Apr 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 20 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016