skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 18/07/2019 9:47:08 AM

Velos, Pamela

CPSO#: 31613

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 18 Jun 1979
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1980

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
200 Fletcher Cres
PO Box 4000
Alliston ON  L9R 1W7
Phone: (705) 435-3377 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Pamela Velos Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 25 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Velos ( CPSO# 31613 )

Business Address:
Stevenson Memorial Hospital
200 Fletcher Crescent
Box 4000
Alliston ON  L9R 1W7
Phone Number: (705) 435-3377


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Cyprus

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 20 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PAMELA VELOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VELOS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1980