skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 16/09/2019 10:40:01 PM

Hibberd, Peter Hunt

CPSO#: 31562

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 18 Jun 1980
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 1980

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 141
277 Royal Poinciana Way
Palm Beach FL  33480
United States
Phone: (561) 655-4477
Fax: (561) 655-7245

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Connecticut

USA - Florida

USA - Illinois

USA - Indiana

USA - Kentucky

USA - Texas

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PETER HUNT HIBBERD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HIBBERD is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1978
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1980