skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 24/06/2019 3:33:53 PM

Lai, Christopher Chiu-Ching

CPSO#: 31501

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 27 May 1980
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 May 1980

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Curans Heart Centre
1165 Barton Street
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 5N3
Phone: (807) 345-3355
Fax: (807) 345-0099 Electoral District: 09

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: C. Lai Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 04 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Lai ( CPSO# 31501 )

Business Address:
1165 Barton Street
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 5N3
Phone Number: (807) 345-3355

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Atikokan General Hospital Atikokan
Hornepayne Community Hospital Hornepayne
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1981 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 06 Dec 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER CHIU-CHING LAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 May 1980