skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 19/07/2019 12:27:09 AM

Pang, Mee Wan Susan

CPSO#: 31350

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: MWS Pang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 3 2018

Medical Records Location

Address: Humber River Regional Hospital 1235 Wilson Ave Toronto, ON M3M 0B2 or Ellesmere Medical Management Inc. 520 Ellesmere Rd Scarborough, ON M1R 0B1
Date Received: 06 May 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 01 Jan 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Feb 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2019