skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 20/07/2019 6:28:00 PM

Birnbaum, Alexander

CPSO#: 31296

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 May 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 May 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Birnbaum Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 31 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Birnbaum ( CPSO# 31296 )

Business Address:
Suite 3M03
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6119

Medical Records Location

Address: Medical records may be obtained from Release of Information Helath Records St Joseph's Health Centre 30 The Queensway Toronto ON M6R 1B5 or Records related to prior practice at 211-2238 Dundas St W are stored by: RSRS 1-888-563-3732 ext 1
Date Received: 17 Oct 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 07 Dec 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 May 2019