skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 16/06/2019 7:13:04 AM

Phillips, Susan Paula

CPSO#: 31212

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 12 Jun 1978
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 05 Nov 1979

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Family Medicine Centre
Of Queens University
220 Bagot Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5E9
Phone: (613) 533-9303 Ext. 73935 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: S.P. Phillips Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 16 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Phillips ( CPSO# 31212 )

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Family Medical Centre
Of Queens University
220 Bagot Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5E9
Phone Number: (613) 533-9303

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1980 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SUSAN PAULA PHILLIPS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PHILLIPS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Nov 1979