skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 19/06/2019 11:17:37 PM

Loney, Elgin McConnell

CPSO#: 31190

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 14 Aug 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 14 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 1979
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2013
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2013
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 18 Jan 2014
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 14 Aug 2014