skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 21/08/2019 1:13:59 AM

Sajo, Iidiko Mary

CPSO#: 31168

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 14 Mar 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 14 Mar 2019
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hungarian

Education:McGill University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients seeking a copy of their medical record may contact Woburn Medical Dental Centre at: 4129 Lawrence Avenue East, Scarborough, ON, M1E 2S2, or via telephone: 416-439-1991, or via Fax: 416-439-3593.
Date Received: 11 Feb 2019

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 1979
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 28 Jan 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Dec 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 14 Mar 2019

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Member
Active Date: July 16, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Iidiko Mary Sajo to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective July 16, 2019:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Sajo engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in her family medicine practice. In the face of these allegations, Dr. Sajo resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
Download Full Document (PDF)