skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 18/07/2019 9:08:28 AM

Delva, Mary Dianne

CPSO#: 31100

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 27 Aug 1979
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Aug 1979

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bruyere Family Medicine Center
75 Bruyere Street
Ottawa ON  K1N 5C8
Phone: (613) 241-3344
Fax: (613) 241-1971 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Delva Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 04 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Delva ( CPSO# 31100 )
Dr. N. Delva ( CPSO# 31316 )

Business Address:
72 Bruyere Street
Ottawa ON  K1N 5C8
Phone Number: (613) 241-3344

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3400

Business Address:
220 Bagot Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3G2
Phone Number: (613) 533-9303

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bruyere Continuing Care-Elisabeth Bruyere Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1979 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARY DIANNE DELVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DELVA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 1979