skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 19/06/2019 9:25:37 AM

Blanchette, Victor Stanley

CPSO#: 30991

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 Jul 1979
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Jul 1979

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cambridge, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Hematology and
Oncology
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-5852
Fax: (416) 813-5327 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Victor Blanchette Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 22 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Blanchette ( CPSO# 30991 )

Business Address:
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Hematology and Oncology
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-5852

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 13 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 20 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. VICTOR STANLEY BLANCHETTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLANCHETTE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1979