skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 19/08/2019 4:38:08 PM

Livshin, Oleg

CPSO#: 30978

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 18 Jul 1979
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 18 Jul 1979

Summary

Former Name: Livshits, Oleg (used until: 20 Mar 1984 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:First Moscow Order of Lenin Medical Inst, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 304
7131 Bathurst Street
Thornhill ON  L4J 7Z1
Phone: (905) 882-1400
Fax: (905) 882-1406 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: O. Livshin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 22 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Livshin ( CPSO# 30978 )

Business Address:
Suite 304
7131 Bathurst Street
Thornhill ON  L4J 7Z1
Phone Number: (905) 882-1400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. OLEG LIVSHIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIVSHIN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 1977
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1979