skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 17/07/2019 5:04:14 AM

Buttar, Kulwant Kaur

CPSO#: 30939

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 19 Nov 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 19 Nov 2018
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Punjab University India, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: K. K. Buttar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 6 2019

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - New York

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Dec 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2000 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jun 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Nov 2018

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Member
Active Date: November 19, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Kulwant Kaur Buttar to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective November 19, 2018:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Buttar failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession. During the Investigation, Dr. Buttar resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario.
Download Full Document (PDF)