skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/08/2019 11:52:37 AM

Morris, Brian Alexander Perry

CPSO#: 30881

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 12 Jun 1978
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 02 Jul 1979

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
190 Cundles Road East
Suite 303
Barrie ON  L4M 4S5
Phone: (705) 728-3722
Fax: (705) 728-9449 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Brian Morris Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 09 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Morris ( CPSO# 30881 )

Business Address:
190 Cundles Road East
Suite 303
Barrie ON  L4M 4S5
Phone Number: (705) 728-3722

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1980 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BRIAN ALEXANDER PERRY MORRIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MORRIS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1979