skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 20/07/2019 6:35:37 PM

Lavelle, Peter Raymond

CPSO#: 30866

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Peter Raymond Lavelle Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 19 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Lavelle ( CPSO# 30866 )

Business Address:
Medical Arts Building
353 St. Paul Avenue
Brantford ON  N3R 4N3
Phone Number: (519) 756-8601

Medical Records Location

Address: 23 Brier Place Brantford ON N3R 3M3
Date Received: 10 May 2019

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2019