skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 26/06/2019 10:12:15 AM

Chu, Joseph Yiu-Cho

CPSO#: 30854

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 12 Jun 1978
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1979

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English, Mandarin

Education:University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queensway Professional Centre
190 Sherway Drive
Suite 312
Toronto ON  M9C 5N2
Phone: (416) 626-0740
Fax: (416) 626-0635 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Joseph Y. Chu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Chu ( CPSO# 30854 )

Business Address:
Queensway Professional Centre
312 - 190 Sherway Drive
Etobicoke ON  M9C 5N2
Phone Number: (416) 626-0740


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - California

USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1982 RCPSC Specialist
Neurology Effective: 27 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JOSEPH YIU-CHO CHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHU is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1979