skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 21/08/2019 12:39:03 PM

Mackenzie, Ewen James Macdonald

CPSO#: 30813

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Ewen Mackenzie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 1 2015

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1978 to 14 Jun 1979
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 11 Feb 2002 to 10 May 2002
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1978
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016