skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 20/06/2019 7:41:47 AM

McNally, Catherine Margaret

CPSO#: 30724

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 06 Jun 1979
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 06 Jun 1979

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Welcare Centre
Balmoral Medical Arts Facility
1366 Yonge Street
Suite 305
Toronto ON  M4T 3A7
Phone: (416) 962-2964
Fax: (416) 962-2526 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Catherine M. McNally Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 12 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. C. McNally ( CPSO# 30724 )

Business Address:
The Welcare Centre
Balmoral Medical Arts Facility
305 - 1366 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4T 3A7
Phone Number: (416) 962-2964

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1981 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CATHERINE MARGARET MCNALLY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCNALLY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 1979