skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 17/08/2019 10:47:59 PM

Maciver, Angus Graham

CPSO#: 30719

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Jun 1973
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 04 Jun 1979
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Line 16 Perth South 911# 4759
RR7 St.Marys
St Marys ON  N4X 1C9
Phone: 519 393 5579 Electoral District: 02

Additional Practice Location(s)

19 Hospital Dr, Moose Factory ON
Moose Factory ON  P0L 1W0
Canada
Phone: (705) 658-4544
Fax: (705) 658-4917
County: Territorial District of Cochrane
Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Angus Maciver Medicine, Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 28 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Maciver ( CPSO# 30719 )

Business Address:
4759 Line 16
Perth South, RR #7
St Marys ON  N4X 1C9
Phone Number: (519) 393-5579

Business Address:
19 Hospital Drive
Moose Factory ON  P0L 1W0
Phone Number: (705) 658-4544


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Northwest Territories

Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Seaforth Community Hospital Seaforth
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
St Mary's Memorial Hospital St Marys
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority,Moose Factory Site Moose Factory

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 13 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANGUS GRAHAM MACIVER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACIVER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 1979

Pending Hearings Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Summary:

Allegations of Dr. Maciver’s professional misconduct have been referred to the Discipline Committee of the College. It is alleged that Dr. Maciver engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct and/or conduct unbecoming a physician in his social media communications, including his comments regarding other physicians on Twitter.


Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)