skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 20/07/2019 7:33:31 AM

Ginsburg, Jonathan Charles

CPSO#: 30698

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cape Town, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: J. C. Ginsburg Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 9 2018

Medical Records Location

Address: SafeStor Records Management 2704 Highway 20 Fonthill ON L0S 1E2
Date Received: 19 Apr 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 May 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018