skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 20/07/2019 7:36:26 AM

Mohr, Veronica Renate

CPSO#: 30665

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 03 May 1979
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 03 May 1979

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 103
1479 John Counter Blvd
Kingston ON  K7M 7J3
Phone: (613) 544-2902
Fax: (613) 544-5768 Electoral District: 06

Additional Practice Location(s)

Street Health Centre
115 Barrack St
Kingston ON  K7K 1G2
Canada
Phone: (613) 549-1440
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: V. Mohr Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 02 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Mohr ( CPSO# 30665 )

Business Address:
103-1479 John Counter Boulevard
Kingston ON  K7M 7J3
Phone Number: (613) 544-2902

Business Address:
Willow Family Physicians
325 University Avenue
Kingston ON  K7L 3R4
Phone Number: (613) 544-2902

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1981 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. VERONICA RENATE MOHR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOHR is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 May 1979